THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:06:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 510 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-854-1660
Fax: 807-854-0227
Address: Geraldton District Hospital
500 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
Phone: (807) 854-1660
Fax: (807) 854-0227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Hargassner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hargassner (CPSO#: 77293 )
Business Address: 500 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
(807) 854-1862
Business Address: 510 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
(807) 854-1660 Extn: 128

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 510 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-854-1660
Fax: 807-854-0227
Address: Geraldton District Hospital
500 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
Phone: (807) 854-1660
Fax: (807) 854-0227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Hargassner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hargassner (CPSO#: 77293 )
Business Address: 500 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
(807) 854-1862
Business Address: 510 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
(807) 854-1660 Extn: 128

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD HARGASSNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARGASSNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD HARGASSNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARGASSNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2002