THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 15:53:05 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brar Medical Clinic
Suite 102
1090 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 790-8400
Fax: (905) 799-3700

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H S Brar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Brar (CPSO#: 77298 )
Business Address: 102 - 1090 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B3
(905) 790-8400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brar Medical Clinic
Suite 102
1090 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 790-8400
Fax: (905) 799-3700

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H S Brar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Brar (CPSO#: 77298 )
Business Address: 102 - 1090 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B3
(905) 790-8400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARPREET SINGH BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARPREET SINGH BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2002