THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:34:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 414-Unit 3
Main Street
Port Dover ON N0A 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2265349771
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Port Rowan Medical Centre
1035 Bay Street
Port Rowan Ontario N0E 1M0
Phone: (519) 586-3143
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Trzcieniecka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Trzcieniecka (CPSO#: 77325 )
Business Address: 1035 Bay Street
Port Rowan Ontario N0E 1M0
Business Address: Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
(519) 582-3535
Business Address: 414 Main Street
Port Dover Ontario N0A 1N0
2265349771

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 414-Unit 3
Main Street
Port Dover ON N0A 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2265349771
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Port Rowan Medical Centre
1035 Bay Street
Port Rowan Ontario N0E 1M0
Phone: (519) 586-3143
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Trzcieniecka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Trzcieniecka (CPSO#: 77325 )
Business Address: 1035 Bay Street
Port Rowan Ontario N0E 1M0
Business Address: Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi Ontario N4B 2L8
(519) 582-3535
Business Address: 414 Main Street
Port Dover Ontario N0A 1N0
2265349771

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA AGATA TRZCIENIECKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRZCIENIECKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA AGATA TRZCIENIECKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRZCIENIECKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2002