THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:17:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Young Street East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 603-0223
Fax: (519) 888-6422

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTOPHER R. STEINGART MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Steingart (CPSO#: 77338 )
Business Address: 29 Young St E
Waterloo ON N2J 2L4
519-603-0223
Business Address: 176 Wyndham St N
Guelph ON N1H 8N9
519-603-0223

Corporation Name: Christopher R. Steingart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Young Street East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 603-0223
Fax: (519) 888-6422

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTOPHER R. STEINGART MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Steingart (CPSO#: 77338 )
Business Address: 29 Young St E
Waterloo ON N2J 2L4
519-603-0223
Business Address: 176 Wyndham St N
Guelph ON N1H 8N9
519-603-0223

Corporation Name: Christopher R. Steingart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RONALD STEINGART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINGART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RONALD STEINGART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINGART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2002