THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:31:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 763-4315
Address: Guelph General Hospital
Emergency Department
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 822 5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Dason Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dason (CPSO#: 77353 )
Business Address: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 763-4315
Address: Guelph General Hospital
Emergency Department
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 822 5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Dason Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dason (CPSO#: 77353 )
Business Address: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
24 Jun 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 24 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from June 24, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jeyapandy Thangaiah Dason in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dason to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. JEYAPANDY THANGAIAH DASON
(“Dr. Dason”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Dason, certificate of registration number 77353, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-457587-B7Z3P4 (the “Investigation”) into my care of a patient in my emergency medicine practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:

1. Colwell C. Geriatric trauma: Initial evaluation and management. In: Grayzel J, ed. UpToDate. UpToDate; 2024. Accessed June 13, 2024;
2. Strudwick K, McPhee M, Bell A, Martin-Khan M, Russell T. Review article: Best practice management of common ankle and foot injuries in the emergency department (part 2 of the musculoskeletal injuries rapid review series). Emerg Med Australas. 2018;30(2):152-180;
3. Germann CA, Perron AD, Miller MD, Powell SM, Brady WJ. Orthopedic pitfalls in the ED: calcaneal fractures. Am J Emerg Med. 2004;22(7):607-611;
4. Old JL, Calvert M. Vertebral compression fractures in the elderly. Am Fam Physician. 2004;69(1):111-116;
5. Koehler SM. Ankle fractures in adults. In: Grayzel J, ed. UpToDate. UpToDate; 2022. Accessed June 6, 2024;
6. Medical Records Documentation, College policy.

(b) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.

(d) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(6) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Dason, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (“the Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor” or “Assessors”). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the terms of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Dason, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Dason, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(12) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(13) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Dason’s care of a patient in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Dason will engage in professional education in medical record keeping, and in assessing, examining, and managing patients with injuries related to falls, with traumatic fractures of the foot and ankle, and with back pain related to trauma.

Dr. Dason’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the completion of the professional education.

(c) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Dason, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and/or to all Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Dason, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Dason, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(c) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(d) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from June 24, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jeyapandy Thangaiah Dason in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dason to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. JEYAPANDY THANGAIAH DASON
(“Dr. Dason”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Dason, certificate of registration number 77353, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-457587-B7Z3P4 (the “Investigation”) into my care of a patient in my emergency medicine practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:

1. Colwell C. Geriatric trauma: Initial evaluation and management. In: Grayzel J, ed. UpToDate. UpToDate; 2024. Accessed June 13, 2024;
2. Strudwick K, McPhee M, Bell A, Martin-Khan M, Russell T. Review article: Best practice management of common ankle and foot injuries in the emergency department (part 2 of the musculoskeletal injuries rapid review series). Emerg Med Australas. 2018;30(2):152-180;
3. Germann CA, Perron AD, Miller MD, Powell SM, Brady WJ. Orthopedic pitfalls in the ED: calcaneal fractures. Am J Emerg Med. 2004;22(7):607-611;
4. Old JL, Calvert M. Vertebral compression fractures in the elderly. Am Fam Physician. 2004;69(1):111-116;
5. Koehler SM. Ankle fractures in adults. In: Grayzel J, ed. UpToDate. UpToDate; 2022. Accessed June 6, 2024;
6. Medical Records Documentation, College policy.

(b) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.

(d) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(6) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Dason, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (“the Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor” or “Assessors”). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the terms of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Dason, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Dason, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Dason, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(12) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(13) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Dason’s care of a patient in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Dason will engage in professional education in medical record keeping, and in assessing, examining, and managing patients with injuries related to falls, with traumatic fractures of the foot and ankle, and with back pain related to trauma.

Dr. Dason’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the completion of the professional education.

(c) I, Dr. Dason, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Dason, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and/or to all Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Dason, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Dason, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(c) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(d) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 Jun 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jeyapandy Thangaiah Dason to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 24, 2024:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Dason’s care of a patient in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Dason will engage in professional education in medical record keeping, and in assessing, examining, and managing patients with injuries related to falls, with traumatic fractures of the foot and ankle, and with back pain related to trauma.

Dr. Dason’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the completion of the professional education.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 Jun 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jeyapandy Thangaiah Dason to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 24, 2024:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Dason’s care of a patient in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Dason will engage in professional education in medical record keeping, and in assessing, examining, and managing patients with injuries related to falls, with traumatic fractures of the foot and ankle, and with back pain related to trauma.

Dr. Dason’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the completion of the professional education.

Training

Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2002