THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 07:01:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Westney Heights Medical Centre
15 Westney Road North
Ajax Ontario L1T 1P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 428-8055
Fax: (905) 428-1501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. A. Izzeldin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Izzeldin (CPSO#: 77362 )
Business Address: Westney Heights Medical Centre
2 - 15 Westney Road North
Ajax Ontario L1T 1P4
(905) 428-8055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Westney Heights Medical Centre
15 Westney Road North
Ajax Ontario L1T 1P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 428-8055
Fax: (905) 428-1501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. A. Izzeldin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Izzeldin (CPSO#: 77362 )
Business Address: Westney Heights Medical Centre
2 - 15 Westney Road North
Ajax Ontario L1T 1P4
(905) 428-8055

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABUELGASIM AHMED IZZELDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZZELDIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABUELGASIM AHMED IZZELDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZZELDIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2002