THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 15:51:56 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Extension: 33250
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Der Walt, Van Sittert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Sittert (CPSO#: 77411 ) Dr. L. Van Der Walt (CPSO#: 77423 )
Business Address: Fonthill Family Medical Centre
Suite 205
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
(905) 735-0725
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 230 Bertte Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
(905) 378-4647

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Extension: 33250
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Der Walt, Van Sittert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Sittert (CPSO#: 77411 ) Dr. L. Van Der Walt (CPSO#: 77423 )
Business Address: Fonthill Family Medical Centre
Suite 205
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
(905) 735-0725
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 230 Bertte Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
(905) 378-4647

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAMBERT WILLEM VAN SITTERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN SITTERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAMBERT WILLEM VAN SITTERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN SITTERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2002