THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 22:19:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Urgent Care Clinic
51 Mountainash Road, Unit 8
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: (905) 799-2722
Fax: (905) 799-6727
Address: William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton West Urgent Care Clinic
10088 McLaughlin Road
Unit 14
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X6
Phone: 905-799-2971
Fax: 416-750-1500
Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd, Unit 10
Toronto Ontario M9W 6N5
Phone: (416) 907-5362
Fax: (416) 741-3542
Address: Woodbridge Urgent Care Clinic
4000 Highway 7, Unit 2
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8Z2
Phone: (905) 851-3777
Fax: (905) 851-0682

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Haider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haider (CPSO#: 77418 )
Business Address: Unit 8
51 Mountainash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
(416) 741-2273
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
(905) 212-1433

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Urgent Care Clinic
51 Mountainash Road, Unit 8
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: (905) 799-2722
Fax: (905) 799-6727
Address: William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton West Urgent Care Clinic
10088 McLaughlin Road
Unit 14
Brampton Ontario L7A 2X6
Phone: 905-799-2971
Fax: 416-750-1500
Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd, Unit 10
Toronto Ontario M9W 6N5
Phone: (416) 907-5362
Fax: (416) 741-3542
Address: Woodbridge Urgent Care Clinic
4000 Highway 7, Unit 2
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8Z2
Phone: (905) 851-3777
Fax: (905) 851-0682

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Haider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haider (CPSO#: 77418 )
Business Address: Unit 8
51 Mountainash Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
(416) 741-2273
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
(905) 212-1433

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMIL HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMIL HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2002