THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:51:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 107
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 693-1795
Fax: (905) 693-0970

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hossam Makar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Makar (CPSO#: 77420 )
Business Address: Unit 107
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 693-1795

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 107
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 693-1795
Fax: (905) 693-0970

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hossam Makar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Makar (CPSO#: 77420 )
Business Address: Unit 107
330 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 693-1795

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOSSAM SARWAT HABIB MAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOSSAM SARWAT HABIB MAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2002