THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:18:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SWAHILI, TULU, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Iroquois Ridge Medical Centre
Unit B5
360 Dundas Street East
Oakville Ontario L6H 6Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 257-8777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SNEHA VORA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vora (CPSO#: 77438 )
Business Address: 360 Dundas St E
Iroquois Ridge Medical and Dermal Clinic
Unit B5
Oakville Ontario L6H 6Z9
Business Address: 5-360 Dundas St E
Unit B5
905-257-8777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SWAHILI, TULU, URDU
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Iroquois Ridge Medical Centre
Unit B5
360 Dundas Street East
Oakville Ontario L6H 6Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 257-8777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SNEHA VORA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vora (CPSO#: 77438 )
Business Address: 360 Dundas St E
Iroquois Ridge Medical and Dermal Clinic
Unit B5
Oakville Ontario L6H 6Z9
Business Address: 5-360 Dundas St E
Unit B5
905-257-8777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SNEHA VORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SNEHA VORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2002