THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:39:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401A-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-9232
Extension: 1
Fax: (905) 828-1779
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Diabetes Management Centre
Clinical & Administrative Building
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7545
Fax: (905) 804-7955

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andy Suk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suk (CPSO#: 77441 )
Business Address: Suite 401A
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 272-8984

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401A-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-9232
Extension: 1
Fax: (905) 828-1779
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Diabetes Management Centre
Clinical & Administrative Building
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7545
Fax: (905) 804-7955

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andy Suk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suk (CPSO#: 77441 )
Business Address: Suite 401A
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 272-8984

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDY GERALD SUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDY GERALD SUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2002