THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:08:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus C8 - 128
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3287
Fax: (519) 663-3313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colquhoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Colquhoun (CPSO#: 77449 )
Business Address: 2333 Waterside Court
London Ontario N6G 5L2
Business Address: 2333 Waterside Court
London Ontario N6G 5L2

Corporation Name: Colquhoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus C8 - 128
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3287
Fax: (519) 663-3313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colquhoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Colquhoun (CPSO#: 77449 )
Business Address: 2333 Waterside Court
London Ontario N6G 5L2
Business Address: 2333 Waterside Court
London Ontario N6G 5L2

Corporation Name: Colquhoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK HORTON DANVERS COLQUHOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLQUHOUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK HORTON DANVERS COLQUHOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLQUHOUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2002