THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104A
300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 245-0616
Fax: (905) 245-0618
Address: 5959 Anderson St. Suite 1A
Brooklin Ontario L1M2E9
Phone: 905-655-3321
Fax: 905-655-4848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manoj Tahiliani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tahiliani (CPSO#: 77454 )
Business Address: 1A-5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin Ontario L1M 2E9
(905) 655-3321
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 104A - 300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
(905) 245-0616

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104A
300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 245-0616
Fax: (905) 245-0618
Address: 5959 Anderson St. Suite 1A
Brooklin Ontario L1M2E9
Phone: 905-655-3321
Fax: 905-655-4848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manoj Tahiliani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tahiliani (CPSO#: 77454 )
Business Address: 1A-5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin Ontario L1M 2E9
(905) 655-3321
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 104A - 300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
(905) 245-0616

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANOJ TAHILIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHILIANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANOJ TAHILIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHILIANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2002