THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:28:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 172 Ethel Street, suite 2B
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 1V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 753-6319
Fax: (705) 580-2292

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients can send any requests for medical records to:

172 Ethel Street
Box 42
Sturgeon Falls, ON
P2B 1V9

Date Received: 11 Jan 2012

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Labelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Labelle (CPSO#: 77468 )
Business Address: 172 Ethel Street
Suite 2B
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 1V9
(705) 753-6725

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 172 Ethel Street, suite 2B
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 1V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 753-6319
Fax: (705) 580-2292

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients can send any requests for medical records to:

172 Ethel Street
Box 42
Sturgeon Falls, ON
P2B 1V9

Date Received: 11 Jan 2012

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Labelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Labelle (CPSO#: 77468 )
Business Address: 172 Ethel Street
Suite 2B
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 1V9
(705) 753-6725

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY VICTOR LABELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABELLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY VICTOR LABELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABELLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002