THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:27:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5230 Mitch Owens Rd
Manotick ON K4M 0V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136922571
Fax: 6136920271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shirin Lal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lal (CPSO#: 77470 )
Business Address: 5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick Ontario K4M 1B2
(613) 692-2571
Business Address: 2ndfl-5230 Mitch Owens Rd
Manotick ON K4M 0V1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5230 Mitch Owens Rd
Manotick ON K4M 0V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136922571
Fax: 6136920271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shirin Lal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lal (CPSO#: 77470 )
Business Address: 5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick Ontario K4M 1B2
(613) 692-2571
Business Address: 2ndfl-5230 Mitch Owens Rd
Manotick ON K4M 0V1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRIN BALA LAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRIN BALA LAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002