THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 78
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 17687
Fax: (613) 761-4147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ralph Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lee (CPSO#: 77471 )
Business Address: 78 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 17687

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 78
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 17687
Fax: (613) 761-4147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ralph Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lee (CPSO#: 77471 )
Business Address: 78 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 17687

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RALPH FRANCIS LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RALPH FRANCIS LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002