THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3rd Floor
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 8Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 721-0370
Fax: (705) 797-2033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Tailor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tailor (CPSO#: 77505 )
Business Address: 370 Bayview Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie Ontario L4N 0M7
705 721 0370 Extn: 2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3rd Floor
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 8Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 721-0370
Fax: (705) 797-2033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Tailor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tailor (CPSO#: 77505 )
Business Address: 370 Bayview Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie Ontario L4N 0M7
705 721 0370 Extn: 2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADARSH TAILOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAILOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADARSH TAILOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAILOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002