THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:00:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Suite 6E 249
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3835
Fax: (416) 340-3000
Address: Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Address: 829 St Clair Avenue west
Toronto Ontario M6C1C2
Phone: 4168833783
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Horlick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Horlick (CPSO#: 77507 )
Business Address: Etobicoke Medical Centre
400 - 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W4
(416) 621-2220 Extn: 262
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 6E-249
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3835
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Suite 6E 249
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3835
Fax: (416) 340-3000
Address: Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Address: 829 St Clair Avenue west
Toronto Ontario M6C1C2
Phone: 4168833783
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Horlick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Horlick (CPSO#: 77507 )
Business Address: Etobicoke Medical Centre
400 - 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W4
(416) 621-2220 Extn: 262
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 6E-249
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3835
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC MITCHELL HORLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORLICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC MITCHELL HORLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORLICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 2002