THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:30:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 4000 Stn Main
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
Alliston ON L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-3377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hoi Kwan Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee (CPSO#: 77516 )
Business Address: PO Box 4000 Stn Main
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia
Alliston ON L9R 1W7
7054353377
Business Address: York Medical Centre
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
(905) 853-0404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 4000 Stn Main
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
Alliston ON L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-3377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hoi Kwan Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee (CPSO#: 77516 )
Business Address: PO Box 4000 Stn Main
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia
Alliston ON L9R 1W7
7054353377
Business Address: York Medical Centre
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
(905) 853-0404

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Feb 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 11 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Hoi Kwan Lee may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia,
limited to:

(i) ASA Class I, II and III adult patients, and

(ii) ASA Class I, II and III paediatric patients over two years of age


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Hoi Kwan Lee may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia,
limited to:

(i) ASA Class I, II and III adult patients, and

(ii) ASA Class I, II and III paediatric patients over two years of age


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002