THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:05:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Neurology
30 Bond Street Shuter 3 004
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James J. Marriott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marriott (CPSO#: 77518 )
Business Address: 17-716PGT
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
4168645377

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Neurology
30 Bond Street Shuter 3 004
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James J. Marriott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marriott (CPSO#: 77518 )
Business Address: 17-716PGT
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
4168645377

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES JOHN MARRIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES JOHN MARRIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002