THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:33:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 4
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2405
Fax: (613) 548-1330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Gaudet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gaudet (CPSO#: 77521 )
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 4
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
613-548-2405

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 4
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2405
Fax: (613) 548-1330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Gaudet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gaudet (CPSO#: 77521 )
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 4
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
613-548-2405

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE GAUDET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUDET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE GAUDET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUDET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002