THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite# 295
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 842 9046
Fax: 905 842 9047

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharn Bhandhal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhandhal (CPSO#: 77548 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: Suite 320
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 220-4926

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Pune, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite# 295
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 842 9046
Fax: 905 842 9047

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharn Bhandhal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhandhal (CPSO#: 77548 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: Suite 320
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 220-4926

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARN HARPAL BHANDHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANDHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARN HARPAL BHANDHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANDHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2002