THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:56:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 128
101 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-633-3801
Fax: (905) 286-0008
Address: c/o Stroke Prevention clinic
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B2V2
Phone: 9058487379
Fax: 9058487669

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 31 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Verity J. John Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. John (CPSO#: 77550 )
Business Address: Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-0001 Extn: 2
Business Address: 128-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
289-633-3801

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 128
101 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-633-3801
Fax: (905) 286-0008
Address: c/o Stroke Prevention clinic
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B2V2
Phone: 9058487379
Fax: 9058487669

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 31 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Verity J. John Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. John (CPSO#: 77550 )
Business Address: Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-0001 Extn: 2
Business Address: 128-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
289-633-3801

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VERITY JAYNE JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VERITY JAYNE JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Mar 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Mar 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002