THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:50:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-105 Silvercreek Pky N
Guelph ON N1H 6S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198229363
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lakhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Lakhani (CPSO#: 77553 )
Business Address: 103 - 105 Silvercreek Parkway
Guelph Ontario N1H 6S4
(519) 822-9363

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-105 Silvercreek Pky N
Guelph ON N1H 6S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198229363
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lakhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Lakhani (CPSO#: 77553 )
Business Address: 103 - 105 Silvercreek Parkway
Guelph Ontario N1H 6S4
(519) 822-9363

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZUBAIR LAKHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZUBAIR LAKHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002