THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:47:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 806
Division of Newborn Care
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8561
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory P. Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moore (CPSO#: 77558 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 806
Division of Newborn Care
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8909

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 806
Division of Newborn Care
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8561
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory P. Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moore (CPSO#: 77558 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 806
Division of Newborn Care
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8909

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002