THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eagles Landing Medical Centre
Unit C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-2700
Fax: (905) 303-2780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandy Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schwartz (CPSO#: 77568 )
Business Address: 10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Thornhill Ontario L3T 7R9
(907) 771-7600
Business Address: Eagles Landing Medical Centre
Unit C-9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4H6
(905) 303-2700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eagles Landing Medical Centre
Unit C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 303-2700
Fax: (905) 303-2780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandy Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schwartz (CPSO#: 77568 )
Business Address: 10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Thornhill Ontario L3T 7R9
(907) 771-7600
Business Address: Eagles Landing Medical Centre
Unit C-9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple Ontario L6A 4H6
(905) 303-2700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDY SABRINA SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDY SABRINA SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002