THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:41:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-765 Queen St E
Superior Family Health Team
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 253-6599
Fax: (705) 253-9668
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 May 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brynlea Barbeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Barbeau (CPSO#: 77576 )
Business Address: 300-765 Queen St E
300-765 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
7052536599
Business Address: 11 - 773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0B7
(705) 946-7362

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-765 Queen St E
Superior Family Health Team
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 253-6599
Fax: (705) 253-9668
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 May 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brynlea Barbeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Barbeau (CPSO#: 77576 )
Business Address: 300-765 Queen St E
300-765 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
7052536599
Business Address: 11 - 773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0B7
(705) 946-7362

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYNLEA JAE BARBEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYNLEA JAE BARBEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 May 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 May 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002