THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:41:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Wing
237 Barton Street East
Room 730
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 46781
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aleksa Cenic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cenic (CPSO#: 77581 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Wing
Room 730
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Wing
237 Barton Street East
Room 730
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 46781
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aleksa Cenic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cenic (CPSO#: 77581 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Wing
Room 730
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSA CENIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CENIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSA CENIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CENIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002