THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:08:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Waterloo Regional Health Network
40 Green St Building
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 749 4300
Extension: 4348
Fax: 5197494250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ciccotelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ciccotelli (CPSO#: 77583 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4348
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Waterloo Regional Health Network
40 Green St Building
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 749 4300
Extension: 4348
Fax: 5197494250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ciccotelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ciccotelli (CPSO#: 77583 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4348
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ANTHONY CICCOTELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICCOTELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ANTHONY CICCOTELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICCOTELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002