THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:22:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham-Kent Family Hlth Team
209 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Extension: 2
Fax: (866) 539-6714

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Denys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Denys (CPSO#: 77585 )
Business Address: 209 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
(519) 354-2172

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham-Kent Family Hlth Team
209 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Extension: 2
Fax: (866) 539-6714

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Denys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Denys (CPSO#: 77585 )
Business Address: 209 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
(519) 354-2172

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ALLAN DENYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENYS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ALLAN DENYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENYS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002