THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 06:17:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David P. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fernandes (CPSO#: 77587 )
Business Address: 202 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
(905) 988-1933
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
(905) 945-2253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David P. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fernandes (CPSO#: 77587 )
Business Address: 202 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
(905) 988-1933
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
(905) 945-2253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PHILIP FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PHILIP FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002