THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:34:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Family Medicine
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519) 941-7060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leisha Ostrowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ostrowski (CPSO#: 77607 )
Business Address: 140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-2410
Business Address: Highlands Health Network
Department of Family Medicine
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-7575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Family Medicine
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519) 941-7060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leisha Ostrowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ostrowski (CPSO#: 77607 )
Business Address: 140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-2410
Business Address: Highlands Health Network
Department of Family Medicine
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-7575

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEISHA NICOLE OSTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEISHA NICOLE OSTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002