THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:16:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Marys Medical Clinic
P O Box 1120
268 Maiden Lane
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: (519) 284-4471

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Schiedel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schiedel (CPSO#: 77611 )
Business Address: St Mary's Medical Clinic
268 Maiden Lane
PO Box 1120
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Marys Medical Clinic
P O Box 1120
268 Maiden Lane
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: (519) 284-4471

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Schiedel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schiedel (CPSO#: 77611 )
Business Address: St Mary's Medical Clinic
268 Maiden Lane
PO Box 1120
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN JEFFREY SCHIEDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIEDEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN JEFFREY SCHIEDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIEDEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002