THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:36:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site DVBSRI
C3-108
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 577-1423
Fax: (905) 577-1474

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.D. Schwalm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schwalm (CPSO#: 77612 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site C3-108
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 577-1474

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site DVBSRI
C3-108
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 577-1423
Fax: (905) 577-1474

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.D. Schwalm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schwalm (CPSO#: 77612 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site C3-108
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 577-1474

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JON-DAVID REID SCHWALM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWALM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JON-DAVID REID SCHWALM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWALM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002