THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:38:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peter Munk Cardiac Center
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street 3GW-558A
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5206
Fax: (416) 340-3340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew C. T. Ha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ha (CPSO#: 77634 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
UHN - Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
200 Elizabeth Street
3GW-558A
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-5206

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peter Munk Cardiac Center
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street 3GW-558A
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5206
Fax: (416) 340-3340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew C. T. Ha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ha (CPSO#: 77634 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
UHN - Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
200 Elizabeth Street
3GW-558A
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-5206

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW CHUN TUNG HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW CHUN TUNG HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002