THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:25:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville, Ontario
K0G 1J0
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: (613) 258-4997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jones (CPSO#: 77636 )
Business Address: KDH Health Centre
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
(613) 258-6133
Business Address: 2671 Concession Road
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville, Ontario
K0G 1J0
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: (613) 258-4997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jones (CPSO#: 77636 )
Business Address: KDH Health Centre
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
(613) 258-6133
Business Address: 2671 Concession Road
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER RHYS JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER RHYS JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002