THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 03:19:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-289-6644
Fax: 226-289-6640

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.R. Potvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Warsh (CPSO#: 83535 ) Dr. K. Potvin (CPSO#: 77638 )
Business Address: London Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Room A3-917
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4L6
(519) 685-8640
Business Address: 711 Oxford Street West
The Eir Centre
London Ontario N6H 1V1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-289-6644
Fax: 226-289-6640

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.R. Potvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Warsh (CPSO#: 83535 ) Dr. K. Potvin (CPSO#: 77638 )
Business Address: London Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Room A3-917
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4L6
(519) 685-8640
Business Address: 711 Oxford Street West
The Eir Centre
London Ontario N6H 1V1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLEA RAIJANN POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLEA RAIJANN POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2002