THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44697
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Whittingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Whittingham (CPSO#: 77641 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
415 - 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44550

Corporation Name: Cyriac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cyriac (CPSO#: 70168 ) Dr. H. Whittingham (CPSO#: 77641 )
Business Address: 1000 Middlegate Road
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M3
(905) 804-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44697
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Whittingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Whittingham (CPSO#: 77641 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
415 - 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44550

Corporation Name: Cyriac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cyriac (CPSO#: 70168 ) Dr. H. Whittingham (CPSO#: 77641 )
Business Address: 1000 Middlegate Road
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M3
(905) 804-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE WHITTINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTINGHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE WHITTINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002