THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:47:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6772
Fax: 613-798-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johane Nadeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nadeau (CPSO#: 77643 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 6001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6772
Fax: 613-798-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johane Nadeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nadeau (CPSO#: 77643 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 6001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANE NADEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANE NADEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002