THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:33:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin W.Y. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee (CPSO#: 77648 ) Dr. T. Bennett (CPSO#: 76554 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin W.Y. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee (CPSO#: 77648 ) Dr. T. Bennett (CPSO#: 76554 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN WANN-YEE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN WANN-YEE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002