THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:30:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 7464621
Extension: 4929
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Mulligan Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mulligan (CPSO#: 77655 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613 7464621 Extn: 4929

Corporation Name: Matthew Mulligan Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: Matthew Mulligan Medecine Societe Professionelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 7464621
Extension: 4929
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Mulligan Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mulligan (CPSO#: 77655 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613 7464621 Extn: 4929

Corporation Name: Matthew Mulligan Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: Matthew Mulligan Medecine Societe Professionelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DAVID MULLIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLIGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DAVID MULLIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLIGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002