THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:44:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Address: South Huron Hospital Emergency Dept
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre London
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhimani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bhimani (CPSO#: 77658 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 3N3
(519) 646-6000
Business Address: South Huron Hospital
23 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
(519) 235-3343
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, SWAHILI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Address: South Huron Hospital Emergency Dept
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre London
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhimani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bhimani (CPSO#: 77658 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 3N3
(519) 646-6000
Business Address: South Huron Hospital
23 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
(519) 235-3343
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUNSIF ALI BHIMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHIMANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUNSIF ALI BHIMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHIMANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002