THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:04:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
The Sleep Lab (F-195)
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4636
Fax: (613) 761-5211
Address: Division of Respirology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sleep Disorders Centre
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705)-523-7344
Fax: (705)-523-7284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Chandy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chandy (CPSO#: 77671 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
705-523-7344
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
East Block Basement
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Sleep Lab
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
The Sleep Lab (F-195)
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4636
Fax: (613) 761-5211
Address: Division of Respirology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sleep Disorders Centre
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705)-523-7344
Fax: (705)-523-7284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Chandy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chandy (CPSO#: 77671 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
705-523-7344
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
East Block Basement
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Sleep Lab
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE PARIYAMPADATHU CHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE PARIYAMPADATHU CHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002