THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus
Div of Transplantation
PO Box 3359
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3352
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre, Victoria Hospital
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alp Sener Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sener (CPSO#: 77678 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus
Division of Transplantation
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 3359
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3352

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TURKISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus
Div of Transplantation
PO Box 3359
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3352
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre, Victoria Hospital
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alp Sener Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sener (CPSO#: 77678 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus
Division of Transplantation
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 3359
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3352

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALP SENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALP SENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002