THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:12:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 12
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6895
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tan (CPSO#: 77693 )
Business Address: Unit 12
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(905) 790-6362
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(705) 494-2120
Business Address: 207-10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
9057944497

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 12
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6895
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tan (CPSO#: 77693 )
Business Address: Unit 12
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(905) 790-6362
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(705) 494-2120
Business Address: 207-10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
9057944497

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK BOON-HUAT TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK BOON-HUAT TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002