THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 22:40:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120-1130 Morrison Dr
Ottawa ON K2H 9N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138205050
Fax: 6138207831
Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
Internal Medicine
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 120
1130 Morrison Dr
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 820-5050
Fax: (613) 820-7831

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Cohn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cohn (CPSO#: 77695 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-4842
Business Address: Suite 120
1130 Morrison Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N6
(613) 820-5050

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120-1130 Morrison Dr
Ottawa ON K2H 9N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138205050
Fax: 6138207831
Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
Internal Medicine
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 120
1130 Morrison Dr
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 820-5050
Fax: (613) 820-7831

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Cohn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cohn (CPSO#: 77695 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-4842
Business Address: Suite 120
1130 Morrison Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9N6
(613) 820-5050

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM COHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM COHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002