THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Emergency Medicine
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Extension: 8181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lina S. Chakrabarty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chakrabarty (CPSO#: 77700 )
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 309 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 507-6447

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Emergency Medicine
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Extension: 8181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lina S. Chakrabarty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chakrabarty (CPSO#: 77700 )
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 309 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 507-6447

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINA SUJATA CHAKRABARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABARTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINA SUJATA CHAKRABARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABARTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002