THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:43:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 440 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5888
Extension: 3
Fax: 416-603-5448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BRIAN WONG & SARAH REID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong (CPSO#: 79489 ) Dr. S. Reid (CPSO#: 77735 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite H466
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street, Suite 2W404
Toronto Ontario M5T 2s8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 440 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5888
Extension: 3
Fax: 416-603-5448

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BRIAN WONG & SARAH REID MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong (CPSO#: 79489 ) Dr. S. Reid (CPSO#: 77735 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite H466
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street, Suite 2W404
Toronto Ontario M5T 2s8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JENNIFER REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JENNIFER REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002