THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:11:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sind, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: James Potter Rd Medical Centre
9715 James Potter Road
Unit # 102-103
Brampton Ontario L6X 3B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 457-5800
Fax: (905) 457-5080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdul Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malik (CPSO#: 77751 )
Business Address: James Potter Road Medical Centre
Suite 102
9715 James Potter Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 3B9
(905) 457-5800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU
Medical School: University of Sind, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: James Potter Rd Medical Centre
9715 James Potter Road
Unit # 102-103
Brampton Ontario L6X 3B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 457-5800
Fax: (905) 457-5080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdul Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malik (CPSO#: 77751 )
Business Address: James Potter Road Medical Centre
Suite 102
9715 James Potter Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 3B9
(905) 457-5800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sind, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2002