THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:38:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjay Dhingra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhingra (CPSO#: 77762 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjay Dhingra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhingra (CPSO#: 77762 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY KUMAR DHINGRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHINGRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJAY KUMAR DHINGRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHINGRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2002